This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 10/06/2021 at 19:48:23 (UTC).

PINTO, ANTONIO V TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 PINTO, ANTONIO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , GREGORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , GREGORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PINTO , ANTONIO

Defendant and Respondent

TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

UDOUJ , PAUL

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/17/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4163442

09/02/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4163442

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

09/01/2021:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/01/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/01/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/01/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/01/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

09/01/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/01/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY - 9/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:pudouj@vishioforry.com;service@vishioforry.com;sgassiot@vishioforry.com AS TO DFT TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4163442; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/02/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/02/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4163442; Notes:$411.00 4163442 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AA: Circuit Civil Central - AA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes:pudouj@vishioforry.com;service@vishioforry.com;sgassiot@vishioforry.com CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR DAMAGES; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill Prime Ins Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer UDOUJ , PAUL