This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/16/2019 at 15:00:59 (UTC).

PICONE, SALVATORE V PICONE, MICHELLE

Case Summary

On 10/12/2019 PICONE, SALVATORE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PICONE, MICHELLE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PICONE , SALVATORE

Defendant and Respondent

PICONE , MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WAGNER , JOHN A

 

Court Documents

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

11/06/2019:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ADDENDUM

11/06/2019:ADDENDUM

ORDER SETTING HEARING

10/23/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING

MOTION EVICTION RENT DETERMINATION. FB DFT

10/23/2019:MOTION EVICTION RENT DETERMINATION. FB DFT

RESPONSE TO: EVICTION CASE. FB DFT

10/23/2019:RESPONSE TO: EVICTION CASE. FB DFT

PAID $1.20 ON RECEIPT 3385734

10/23/2019:PAID $1.20 ON RECEIPT 3385734

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/21/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/17/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3368345

10/15/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3368345

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/12/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLTS ATTY & DFT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDENDUM; Notes:TO STIP FOR PAYMENT WITH JMT UPON DEFAULT JUDGE CASTOR ON 11/5/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:ON DETERMINATION OF RENT AND SCHEDULING MEDIATION- 11/5/19 @ 10:15AM- JUDGE GILLMAN DTD 10/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION EVICTION RENT DETERMINATION. FB DFT; Notes:EVICTION RENT DETERMINATION. FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO: EVICTION CASE. FB DFT; Notes:EVICTION CASE. FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $1.20 ON RECEIPT 3385734; Notes:$1.20 3385734 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED MICHELLE PICONE - 10/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:JOHN@JOHNWAGNERLAW.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3368345; Notes:$195.00 3368345 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Receipt Number:3385734; Receipt Amount: $1.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt Number:3368345; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$196.20; total Amount Paid:$196.20; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • Due Date:10/23/2019; Description:CC County Civil Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$1.20; Amount Paid:$1.20; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Due Date:10/15/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Due Date:10/15/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less