This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/12/2019 at 21:38:16 (UTC).

PETIT-FRERE, CHANTALE V ZEGEYE, YONAS MD

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 PETIT-FRERE, CHANTALE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ZEGEYE, YONAS MD. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROWE , CYMONIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROWE , CYMONIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PETIT-FRERE , CHANTALE

Defendants and Respondents

BRAIN AND SPINE INSTITUTE INC

SURGERY CENTER HOLDINGS INC

SURGERY PARTNERS OF LAKE WORTH LLC

ANESTHESIOLOGY PROFESSIONAL SERVICES INC

PSHS ALPHA PARTNERS LTD

SURGERY PARTNERS INC

LENTZ MD, ROBERT E

ZEGEYE MD, YONAS

SURGERY PARTNERS LLC

LAKE WORTH SURGERY CENTER LLC

BERNARD , RAYMOND

COASTAL PALMS ANESTHESIA PROVIDERS LLC

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GARCIA , MARIANO

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MILLER , TODD B

NEWMAN , BENJAMIN W

THOMAS , JENNIFER K

RHYS , ADAM W

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/12/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/11/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/10/2019:REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/08/2019:REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/08/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ACCEPTANCE

07/08/2019:ACCEPTANCE

ACCEPTANCE

07/08/2019:ACCEPTANCE

ACCEPTANCE

07/08/2019:ACCEPTANCE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/08/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/08/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/08/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/08/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/08/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/08/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/03/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/03/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

ACCEPTANCE

06/14/2019:ACCEPTANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE REPORTING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO ANESTHESIOLOGY PROFESSIONAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO CO-DEFENDANTS, LAKE WORTH SURGERY CENTER, LLC, PSHS ALPHA PARTNERS LTD. D/B/A LAKE WORTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INSURANCE INTERROGATORIES TO CO DEFENDANTS, LAKE WORTH SURGERY CENTER, LLC, PSHS ALPHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO CO-DEFENDANT. ANESTHESIOLOGY PROFESSIONAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$15.00; Amount Paid:$15.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Due Date:06/06/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less