This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/07/2019 at 15:01:24 (UTC).

PESCE, JOSEPHINE V PESCE, LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 PESCE, JOSEPHINE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PESCE, LAWRENCE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLLINS , SHERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLLINS , SHERRI L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PESCE , JOSEPHINE

Defendants and Respondents

PESCE , MARIA

PESCE , LAWRENCE

UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

CHAYKIN , JARED BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

HEARING DISPOSITION SHEET

07/23/2019:HEARING DISPOSITION SHEET

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30774 PAGE 110-111

07/23/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30774 PAGE 110-111

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

07/16/2019:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

ORDER SETTING HEARING

07/15/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/15/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/15/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/09/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/09/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3236459

07/09/2019:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 3236459

PAID $225.00 ON RECEIPT 3236459

07/05/2019:PAID $225.00 ON RECEIPT 3236459

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/03/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING DISPOSITION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30774 PAGE 110-111; Notes:AGREED- FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO DFT MARIA PESCE - JUDGE COLLINS DTD 7/23/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFT, LAWRENCE PESCE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION AND ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION (ORSH). HEARING DATE 7/23/19 @ 1:30PM IN COURTROOM 2. SIGNED ON 7/15/19 BY JDG S. COLLINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT MARIA PESCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT MARIA PESCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2019
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LAWRENCE PESCE - 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARIA PESCE - 07/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $225.00 ON RECEIPT 3236459; Notes:$225.00 3236459 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@chaykinlaw.com;Jared@ChaykinLaw.com;Paralegal@chaykinlaw.com LAWRENCE PESCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@chaykinlaw.com;Jared@ChaykinLaw.com;Paralegal@chaykinlaw.com MARIA PESCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes:UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Receipt Number:3236459; Receipt Amount: $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$205.00; total Amount Paid:$205.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Due Date:07/05/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Due Date:07/05/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Due Date:07/05/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAYKIN , JARED BENJAMIN