This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/26/2022 at 22:42:24 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC V RODRIGUEZ, VERONICA LYNN

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, VERONICA LYNN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendants and Respondents

COUNTRYPARK AT BOCA RATON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION I

MALDONADO , JUAN GABRIEL

RODRIGUEZ , VERONICA LYNN

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPER

COUNTRYPARK AT BOCA RATON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PATEL , PRATIK

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KREMPA , DAVID

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

07/07/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/01/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/27/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/27/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REPLY/RESPONSE

06/27/2022:REPLY/RESPONSE

MOTION TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE F/B PLT

06/27/2022:MOTION TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE F/B PLT

STATUS REPORT

06/27/2022:STATUS REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/24/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/24/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

06/16/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING

06/16/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/16/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS

06/16/2022:LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes: ASSOCIATION'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: 7-20-22 AT 8:45AM FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes: REPLY TO ANSWER F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE F/B PLT; Notes: TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS REPORT; Notes: NOTICE OF STATUS & COMPLETION OF SERVICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VERONICA LYNN RODRIGUEZ - 06/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE JUAN GABRIEL MALDONADO - 06/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED COUNTRYPARK AT BOCA RATON HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INC - 06/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@decubaslewis.com;corey.lewis@decubaslewis.com;courtXpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@decubaslewis.com;corey.lewis@decubaslewis.com;courtXpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO JUAN GABRIEL MALDONADO EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@decubaslewis.com;corey.lewis@decubaslewis.com;courtXpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO COUNTRYPARK AT BOCA RATON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@decubaslewis.com;corey.lewis@decubaslewis.com;courtXpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO VERONICA LYNN RODRIGUEZ EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33651 PAGE 1169-1170; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED COMPLAINT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTRYPARK AT BOCA RATON HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PennyMac Loan Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krempa, David Walter