Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/16/2021 at 17:51:21 (UTC).

PEEPLES, KADIAN LATOYA V EDWARDS, RAMON A

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 PEEPLES, KADIAN LATOYA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EDWARDS, RAMON A. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER , KAREN M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER , KAREN M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEEPLES , KADIAN LATOYA

Defendant and Respondent

EDWARDS , RAMON A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:ADDRESSED TO RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUD DISSOLVING MARRIAGE BOOK 32092 PAGE 603-604; Notes:WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) DTD 1/7/21 JUDGE MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:ADDRESSED TO RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:ADDRESSED TO RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING; Notes:1/7/2021 1:30 PM JD MILLER DTD 12/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING; Notes:1/7/21 AT 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM DTD 12/9/20 JUDGE MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMOT/NOT TO SET NON JURY TRIAL; Notes:F/B- PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:F/B- PET AGAINST RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:RAMON A EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Notes:FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO CHILDREN OR PROPERTY FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes:FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAPPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY; Notes:FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes:FILED BY PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCIVIL DATE OF BIRTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FI: Family North County - FI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less