This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/26/2022 at 21:09:48 (UTC).

PATTERSON, SHAVELE V RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 PATTERSON, SHAVELE filed an Other lawsuit against RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HAFELE , DONALD W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HAFELE , DONALD W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PATTERSON , SHAVELE

Defendants and Respondents

RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC

RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROTSTEIN , JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

02/25/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

02/15/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/28/2021:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/28/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/28/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/28/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/28/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/23/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/23/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/23/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/23/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/23/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/23/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

COMPLAINT

12/03/2021:COMPLAINT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/29/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4251795

11/17/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4251795

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/17/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

11/17/2021:COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION; Notes:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:DENIAL F/B ATTY JONATHAN I ROTSTEIN OBO PET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY JONATHAN I ROTSTEIN OBO PET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:F/B ATTY JONATHAN I ROTSTEIN OBO PET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:F/B ATTY JONATHAN I ROTSTEIN OBO PET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:F/B ATTY JONATHAN I ROTSTEIN OBO PET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC 11/23/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4251795; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/17/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/17/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4251795; Notes:$411.00 4251795 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:l.bonner@rotstein-shiffman.com;m.otto@rotstein-shiffman.com;t.dallarosa@rotstein-shiffman.com AS TO RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:ORIGINAL F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac