This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 06/30/2021 at 13:03:26 (UTC).

PARRALES, JORGE V PARRALES, HAGER

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 PARRALES, JORGE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against PARRALES, HAGER. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PARRALES , JORGE

Defendant and Respondent

PARRALES , HAGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BISHOW , ALLISON L.

SOTO , CARMEN G.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CHAYKIN , JARED BENJAMIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes:RESPONDENT. HAGER PARRALES'S MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF UMC HEARING 07-22-21 8:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:F/B ATTY CHAYKIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:F/B RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY CHAYKIN OBO RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:8/26/21 AT 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM DTD 6/14/21 JUDGE KERNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED HAGER PARRALES - 06-02-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4044108; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4042789; Receipt Amount: $311.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$321.00; total Amount Paid:$321.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketPAID $311.00 ON RECEIPT 4042789; Notes:$311.00 4042789 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FZ: South Branch Family Division - FZ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE ATTACH ADA NOTICE TO SUMMONS (PURSUANT TO AO 2.207). ALSO THE CLERK'S ADDRESS NEEDS TO BE ADD TO THE SUMMONS; Notes:SOTOLAWEFILING@GMAIL.COM;CSOTOASSOCIATEATTORNEY@GMAIL.COM PLEASE ATTACH ADA NOTICE TO SUMMONS (PURSUANT TO AO 2.207). ALSO THE CLERK'S ADDRESS NEEDS TO BE ADD TO THE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMOTION VERIFIED URGENT TO RETURN MINOR CHILD TO FLORIDA AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR URGENT TIMESHARING WITH MINOR CHILD F/B PET; Notes:VERIFIED URGENT TO RETURN MINOR CHILD TO FLORIDA AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR URGENT TIMESHARING WITH MINOR CHILD F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:VERIFIED TO DOMESTICATE FOREIGN JUDGMENT F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison Bishow (esq)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOTO , CARMEN G.