Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/05/2021 at 19:58:45 (UTC).

PALM BEACH RESORT AND BEACH CLUB CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC V ADAM S. ARFFA

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 PALM BEACH RESORT AND BEACH CLUB CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against ADAM S ARFFA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALM BEACH RESORT AND BEACH CLUB CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

HPP HOLDINGS LLC

JOHNNY ROY JOHNSON

ROBERT A. BUCK

MELISSA B. PINARD

MARYANNE SERGIO

JOE E. LEASEBURG

JEAN M. BARKER

CAROLE N. MCGOWAN

MELANIE REEDER

CHRISTINE C. EDWARDS

MARY ANN KRZAK

MARIANNE P. KALIN

RICHARD HENRY BEARD

BAYLISS E. SHARP,

STEPHEN M. KELLY

ROBERT NICHOLS

MARY ANN HANSELMANN

SIDNEY D. BAKER

LESLIE REEDER

2,248 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHEIR , CAROLINA SZNAJDERMAN

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

10/23/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/23/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ORDER DENYING GOODMAN DTD 3/1/21: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PLT'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION FORMS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE DENIED AS MOOT

03/01/2021:ORDER DENYING GOODMAN DTD 3/1/21: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PLT'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION FORMS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE DENIED AS MOOT

NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION

02/03/2021:NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/14/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

01/11/2021:CLERK'S DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/07/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/07/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/22/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

12/09/2020:MEMORANDUM OF LAW

PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 3838152

12/09/2020:PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 3838152

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PLTS MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION FORMS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW F/B PLT

12/03/2020:MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PLTS MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION FORMS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW F/B PLT

PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 3813120

11/17/2020:PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 3813120

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/12/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $2,638.50 ON RECEIPT 3789719

10/26/2020:PAID $2,638.50 ON RECEIPT 3789719

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION (BATCH 25)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION (BATCH 24)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING GOODMAN DTD 3/1/21: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PLT'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION FORMS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE DENIED AS MOOT; Notes:GOODMAN DTD 3/1/21: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF PLT'S MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION FORMS AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND MOTION TO APPROVE PROPOSED WAIVER OF SERVICE DENIED AS MOOT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Notes:NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION (BATCH 23)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION (BATCH 22)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION (BATCH 21)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:GOODMAN; ON 2/23/2021 @ 3:30 PM VIA ZOOM DTD 2/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING WAIVER OF SERVICE AND CONSENT TO PROCESS AND ORDER OF PARTITION (BATCH 20)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3790136; Receipt Amount: $600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3789719; Receipt Amount: $2,638.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/26/2020; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$600.00; Amount Paid:$600.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/26/2020; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$2,237.50; Amount Paid:$2,237.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/26/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $600.00 ON RECEIPT 3790136; Notes:$600.00 3790136 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $2,638.50 ON RECEIPT 3789719; Notes:$2,638.50 3789719 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Charles D Baker is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheir, Carolina S