Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/11/2021 at 12:51:57 (UTC).

PALM BEACH COUNTY V WEST PALM BEACH CHRISTIAN CONVENTION CENTER OF JEHOVA'S WITNESSES FLORIDA INC

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 PALM BEACH COUNTY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against WEST PALM BEACH CHRISTIAN CONVENTION CENTER OF JEHOVA'S WITNESSES FLORIDA INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALM BEACH COUNTY

Defendants and Respondents

WEST PALM BEACH CHRISTIAN CONVENTION CENTER OF JEHOVA'S WITNESSES FLORIDA INC

STRATICON LLC

WPB DUGOUT HOTEL LLC

WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK

FORUM III LAND CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

DOROTHY JACKS PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

CITY OF WEST PALM BEACH

CEMEX CONSTRUCTIONS MATERIALS FLORIDA LLC

BANK UNITED NA

AXIAS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LTD INC

RODRIGUEZ MARRERRO , JUANA

FORUM CAPITAL LLC

TRADESMEN INTERNATIONAL LLC

FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY

ANNE M. GANNON AS PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BALMUTH , BARRY S

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FERNANDEZ-ACUNA , YASMIN

BRIGHAM , ANDREW PRINCE

MASKOW , PETER J

STRATTON , CHARLES S

HAIRE , K DENISE

LANDKAMMER , JOHN W

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DENY OR QUASH WPB CHRISTIAN CONVENTION CENTER JEHOVAHS WITNEESE OBJECTION AND MOTION OF DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS MS. MARRERO MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW FUNDS IN THE COURTS REGISTRY FILED BY JUANA MARRERO

01/21/2021:MOTION TO DENY OR QUASH WPB CHRISTIAN CONVENTION CENTER JEHOVAHS WITNEESE OBJECTION AND MOTION OF DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS MS. MARRERO MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW FUNDS IN THE COURTS REGISTRY FILED BY JUANA MARRERO

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

12/04/2020:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

ANSWER

11/30/2020:ANSWER

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

11/27/2020:MEMORANDUM OF LAW

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/24/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST

11/21/2020:REQUEST

MOTION TO THE DROPPING OF DEFENDANT PARTY - F/B DFT JUANA RODRIGUEZ MARRERO PRO SE

11/20/2020:MOTION TO THE DROPPING OF DEFENDANT PARTY - F/B DFT JUANA RODRIGUEZ MARRERO PRO SE

DECLARATION

11/18/2020:DECLARATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/12/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/10/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/10/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ACCEPTANCE

11/10/2020:ACCEPTANCE

ACCEPTANCE

11/10/2020:ACCEPTANCE

ORDER GOODMAN; AMENDING PETITION BY INTERLINEATION; THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND THE PETITION IS AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION TO NAME ANNE M GANNON AS PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR INSTEAD OF DOROTHY JACKS DTD 10/30/2020

10/30/2020:ORDER GOODMAN; AMENDING PETITION BY INTERLINEATION; THE MOTION IS GRANTED AND THE PETITION IS AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION TO NAME ANNE M GANNON AS PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR INSTEAD OF DOROTHY JACKS DTD 10/30/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/27/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER SETTING HEARING

10/27/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING

NOTICE NOTICE OF AMENDMENT OF PETITION BY INTERLINATION

10/23/2020:NOTICE NOTICE OF AMENDMENT OF PETITION BY INTERLINATION

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Notes:DEFENDANT, WEST PALM BEACH CHRISTIAN CONVENTION CENTER OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES FLORIDA, INC.'S OBJECTION TO MS. MARRERO'S CLAIM TO FUNDS AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED DUPLICATE FILING; Notes:MOTION TO DENY (DE # 76) FILED BY JUANA MARRERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DENY OR QUASH WPB CHRISTIAN CONVENTION CENTER JEHOVAHS WITNEESE OBJECTION AND MOTION OF DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS MS. MARRERO MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW FUNDS IN THE COURTS REGISTRY FILED BY JUANA MARRERO; Notes:TO DENY OR QUASH WPB CHRISTIAN CONVENTION CENTER JEHOVAHS WITNEESE OBJECTION AND MOTION OF DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS MS. MARRERO MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW FUNDS IN THE COURTS REGISTRY FILED BY JUANA MARRERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3878818; Receipt Amount: $65.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.10 ON RECEIPT 3878818; Notes:$65.10 3878818 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CLAIM OF WITHDRAWAL OF PETITIONERS DEPOSIT F/B DFT JUANA RODGRIGUEZ MARRERO PRO SE; Notes:CLAIM OF WITHDRAWAL OF PETITIONERS DEPOSIT F/B DFT JUANA RODGRIGUEZ MARRERO PRO SE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT; Notes:PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT; Notes:PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT; Notes:PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCHECK ISSUED; Notes:Court Registry(Led_ID: 600038 Case#: PER FJ DTD 12/4/2020 S/B JUDGE: J. GOODMAN) Check #: 00113401 for $25000 was disbursed.

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:08/20/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$80.00; Amount Paid:$80.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:08/20/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:08/20/2020; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$22.50; Amount Paid:$22.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:08/20/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $509.10 ON RECEIPT 3718633; Notes:$509.10 3718633 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31685 PAGE 1412-1432; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION; Notes:OF TAKING F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:EMINENT DOMAINT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STRATICON LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Woodforest National Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where BANK UNITED ACCOUNT NUMBER is a litigant

Latest cases where Tradesmen International LLC is a litigant