Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/08/2021 at 20:48:47 (UTC).

PALM BEACH COUNTY V JAN REAL ESTATE COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 PALM BEACH COUNTY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against JAN REAL ESTATE COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALM BEACH COUNTY

Defendants and Respondents

ANNE M GANNON, PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

CHINA KITCHEN PGA, INC.

INTECH ENTERPRISES LLC

MR. GYROS OF JUPITER, LLC

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

ANEQ INC

JONATHAN T'S INC

JAN REAL ESTATE COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

MOTHER NATURES PANTRY PGA INC

CITY OF PALM BEACH GARDENS

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

COFFEE HOUSE HOLDINGS INC

CONUNDRUM FOOTWEAR INC

CASA BELLA CONSTRUCTION & REMODELING INC

PIZZA GIRLS PGA, INC

IRISH INVASION INC

4513 PROPERTIES INC

BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

JFR OF SE FLA INC

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BALMUTH , BARRY S

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

PETERSON , HAMPTON C

LUDOVICI , LORENA HART

NASON , NATHAN EARL

JOHNSON , KENNETH N

Other Attorneys

LITTLE , JOHN W

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/19/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/17/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/09/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/09/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/09/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/04/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/04/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/25/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/20/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (F/B PETITIONER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED AZHURE LLC DBA FASTFRAME - 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED TO PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:NOTICE OF FILING ACCEPTANCES OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PETITION IN EMINENT DOMAIN FILED BY FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - F/B ATTY LORENA HART LUDOVICI OBO DFT PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:F/B DFT PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3914125; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$969.60; total Amount Paid:$969.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/22/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$68.00; Amount Paid:$68.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/22/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/22/2020; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$85.00; Amount Paid:$85.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/22/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $559.60 ON RECEIPT 3851915; Notes:$559.60 3851915 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32043 PAGE 1-18; Notes:F/B PT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION; Notes:OF TAKING F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:EMINENT DOMAIN F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHINA KITCHEN PGA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Publix Super Markets Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Communications Inc. is a litigant