Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/14/2021 at 22:28:53 (UTC).

PALM BEACH COUNTY V ALI, ATEF

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 PALM BEACH COUNTY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against ALI, ATEF. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CURLEY , G JOSEPH and KEYSER , GREGORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

KEYSER , GREGORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALM BEACH COUNTY

Defendants and Respondents

ANNE M GANNNON, PALM BEACH COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

ALI , ATEF

ALI , SULTANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BALMUTH , BARRY S

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

STRATTON , CHARLES S

 

Court Documents

NOTICE NOTICE OF TAXES DUE

02/11/2021:NOTICE NOTICE OF TAXES DUE

PAID $115,370.00 ON RECEIPT 3901174

02/08/2021:PAID $115,370.00 ON RECEIPT 3901174

ORDER GKEYSER DTD 01/27/2021 AMENDED STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 152 AMENDED AS TO THE ATTACHMENT OF EXHIBIT A. BOOK 32147 PAGE 267-273

01/27/2021:ORDER GKEYSER DTD 01/27/2021 AMENDED STIPULATED ORDER OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 152 AMENDED AS TO THE ATTACHMENT OF EXHIBIT A. BOOK 32147 PAGE 267-273

ORDER KEYSER; (STIPULATED) OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 152; THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION OVER THE SUBJECT MATTER OF AND THE PARTIES TO THIS CAUSE; THE PROPERTY ACQUIRED IS REASONABLY NECESSARY FOR THIS PUBLIC US AND PURPOSE (SEE ORDER) DTD 1/26/2021 BOOK 32140 PAGE 955-958

01/26/2021:ORDER KEYSER; (STIPULATED) OF TAKING AS TO PARCEL 152; THE COURT HAS JURISDICTION OVER THE SUBJECT MATTER OF AND THE PARTIES TO THIS CAUSE; THE PROPERTY ACQUIRED IS REASONABLY NECESSARY FOR THIS PUBLIC US AND PURPOSE (SEE ORDER) DTD 1/26/2021 BOOK 32140 PAGE 955-958

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/22/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/22/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS F/B DFTS ATEF ALI AND SULTANA ALI

01/22/2021:MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS F/B DFTS ATEF ALI AND SULTANA ALI

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/22/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/22/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER

01/11/2021:ANSWER

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

01/07/2021:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

PAID $434.60 ON RECEIPT 3853398

12/23/2020:PAID $434.60 ON RECEIPT 3853398

DECLARATION

12/18/2020:DECLARATION

LIS PENDENS

12/18/2020:LIS PENDENS

PETITION

12/18/2020:PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/18/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3907463; Receipt Amount: $115,200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$231,004.60; total Amount Paid:$231,004.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/12/2021; Description:Registry disbursement; Amount Due:$115,200.00; Amount Paid:$115,200.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:3907463 $115,200.00 NELSON MULLINS BROAD AND CASSEL TRUST ACCOUNT C/O CHARLES S STRATTON NELSON MULLINS BROAD AND CASSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 3907463; Notes:3907463

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:3907463 $115,200.00 NELSON MULLINS BROAD AND CASSEL TRUST ACCOUNT C/O CHARLES S STRATTON NELSON MULLINS BROAD AND CASSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF TAXES DUE; Notes:NOTICE OF TAXES DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3901174; Receipt Amount: $115,370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/08/2021; Description:Eminent Domain Registry Fee PB; Amount Due:$170.00; Amount Paid:$170.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/08/2021; Description:Eminent Domain Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due:$115,200.00; Amount Paid:$115,200.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3853398; Receipt Amount: $434.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/23/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$28.00; Amount Paid:$28.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/23/2020; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/23/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $434.60 ON RECEIPT 3853398; Notes:$434.60 3853398 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AA: Circuit Civil Central - AA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION; Notes:OF TAKING F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32048 PAGE 90-97; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLES STRATTON