This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 01:50:48 (UTC).

PALM BEACH COUNTY V ACCURATE MACHINERY AND METAL IMPORT EXPORT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/29/2018 PALM BEACH COUNTY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against ACCURATE MACHINERY AND METAL IMPORT EXPORT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALM BEACH COUNTY

Defendants and Respondents

ACCURATE MACHINERY AND METAL IMPORT EXPORT CORPORATION

MONEY STORE INVESTMENT CORPORATION

LP FLA LLC

DAVIS AUTOMOTIVE SERVICE

FREDERICK M DAHLMEIER TRUSTEE

MARINE PLUMBING CO LLC

ACCURATE ORGANIZATION 1211 CORP

DAVIS JR, FLOYD

ANNE M GANNON CONSTITUTIONAL TAX COLLECTOR FOR PBC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BRAUN , MARYANN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SHENKMAN , CURTIS LAUREN

BOYSAW , BRYAN K

WEAVER , H ADAMS

TOMKIEWICZ , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO TRANSFER

06/18/2019:ORDER TO TRANSFER

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT F/B PETITIONER

04/17/2019:NOTICE OF DEPOSIT F/B PETITIONER

PAID $5,960.00 ON RECEIPT 3117160

04/09/2019:PAID $5,960.00 ON RECEIPT 3117160

ORDER SMALL: (STIPULATED ORDER) OF TAKING AS TO PARCELS 334 PETITIONERS SHALL DEPOSIT THE TOTAL SUM OF $5,960.00 INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT WITHIN 20 DAYS DTD 03/22/19 BOOK 30499 PAGE 1626-1632

03/25/2019:ORDER SMALL: (STIPULATED ORDER) OF TAKING AS TO PARCELS 334 PETITIONERS SHALL DEPOSIT THE TOTAL SUM OF $5,960.00 INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT WITHIN 20 DAYS DTD 03/22/19 BOOK 30499 PAGE 1626-1632

ORDER SMALL: OF TAKING AS TO PARCELS 130 AND 330 PETITIONER SHALL DEPOSIT THE SUM OF $17,445.00 INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT WITHIN 20 DAYS * SEE ORD FOR DETAILS * DTD 03/22/19 BOOK 30499 PAGE 1762-1770

03/25/2019:ORDER SMALL: OF TAKING AS TO PARCELS 130 AND 330 PETITIONER SHALL DEPOSIT THE SUM OF $17,445.00 INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT WITHIN 20 DAYS * SEE ORD FOR DETAILS * DTD 03/22/19 BOOK 30499 PAGE 1762-1770

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

03/25/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

DECLARATION

03/13/2019:DECLARATION

ANSWER

02/18/2019:ANSWER

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/08/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/08/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

02/01/2019:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

01/22/2019:UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 2992248

01/11/2019:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 2992248

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

DECLARATION

11/29/2018:DECLARATION

PETITION

11/29/2018:PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/29/2018:CIVIL COVER SHEET

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MEDIATION; Notes:09/17/19 @ 9:30AM F/B ATTY MARYANN BRAUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO COMPEL; Notes:(AMENDED) ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND COMPLIANCE WITH F.S. 73.015. F/B PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO COMPEL; Notes:ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO TRANSFER; Notes:SMALL DTD 6/17/19: CASE TRANSFERRED PURSUANT TO ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 2.302-9/08 TO THE HONORABLE JAMES NUTT DIVISION AO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO TRANSFER (REASSIGN) TO LOWER CASE NUMBER FILED BY PETITIONER; Notes:TO TRANSFER (REASSIGN) TO LOWER CASE NUMBER FILED BY PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • CHECK ISSUED; Notes:Court Registry(Led_ID: 587329 Case#: PER ORD DTD 4/30/19 (LSMALL)) Check #: 00110288 for $5790 was disbursed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:3147572 $5,790.00 FREDERICK M. DAHLMEIER TRUSTEE H. ADAMS WEAVER, ESQUIRE, JONES FOSTER P.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER L. SMALL DTD 4/30/19 REGARDING DAHLMEIER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS. CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE FORTHWITH A CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,790.00 PAYABLE TO RESPONDENT FREDERICK M. DAHLMEIER TRUSTEE. THE WITHDRAWAL OF THESE FUNDS SHALL BE WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHTS OF THE RESPONDENT. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**; Notes:L. SMALL DTD 4/30/19 REGARDING DAHLMEIER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS. CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE FORTHWITH A CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF $5,790.00 PAYABLE TO RESPONDENT FREDERICK M. DAHLMEIER TRUSTEE. THE WITHDRAWAL OF THESE FUNDS SHALL BE WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHTS OF THE RESPONDENT. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 04/30/2019 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • Due Date:01/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Due Date:01/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Due Date:01/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Due Date:01/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Due Date:01/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Due Date:01/11/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Due Date:12/03/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$92.00; Amount Paid:$92.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Due Date:12/03/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Due Date:12/03/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Due Date:12/03/2018; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less