This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 02:30:08 (UTC).

PALM BEACH COUNTY V 1045 SILVER BEACH LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 PALM BEACH COUNTY filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against 1045 SILVER BEACH LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALM BEACH COUNTY

Defendants and Respondents

ACCREDITED MARINE CONSULTANTS INC

1045 SILVER BEACH LLC

GLOBAL ELECTRIC INC

FLEET MAINTENANCE INC

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

GANNON , ANNE M

A PLUS FIREPLACES GRANITE & MARBLE INC

FIRESIDE DISTRIBUTORS INC OF PALM BEACH COUNTY

LB SILVER LLC

PRINSBANK

RAPID AUTO CARE SILVER BEACH LLC

LYES , ALAN J

DELL , STEVEN G

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BRAUN , MARYANN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SELTZ , STEVEN M

FULTON IV IV, ANDREW

MAYOR , ORFELIA M

BALMUTH , BARRY S

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/02/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DFT - F/B DFT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

06/27/2019:MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DFT - F/B DFT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/06/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT - F/B PETITIONER

05/13/2019:NOTICE OF DEPOSIT - F/B PETITIONER

PAID $13,725.00 ON RECEIPT 3150688

05/02/2019:PAID $13,725.00 ON RECEIPT 3150688

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

04/29/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

ORDER J NUTT DTD. 2/12/19 OF TAKING OWNED BY 1045 SILVER BEACH LLC AS TO PARCEL 124 & 324 (TOTAL OF $13,085) BOOK 30540 PAGE 1504-1512

04/12/2019:ORDER J NUTT DTD. 2/12/19 OF TAKING OWNED BY 1045 SILVER BEACH LLC AS TO PARCEL 124 & 324 (TOTAL OF $13,085) BOOK 30540 PAGE 1504-1512

ORDER J NUTT DTD. 4/12/19 OF TAKING OWNED BY FIRESIDE DISTRIBUTORS INC OF PB COUNTY AS TO PARCELS 126 AND 326 (TOTAL OF $28,330) BOOK 30540 PAGE 1455-1463

04/12/2019:ORDER J NUTT DTD. 4/12/19 OF TAKING OWNED BY FIRESIDE DISTRIBUTORS INC OF PB COUNTY AS TO PARCELS 126 AND 326 (TOTAL OF $28,330) BOOK 30540 PAGE 1455-1463

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/11/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/11/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER

02/26/2019:ANSWER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/19/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF TAXES DUE F/B DFT ANNE M GANNON TAX COLLECTOR

02/19/2019:NOTICE OF TAXES DUE F/B DFT ANNE M GANNON TAX COLLECTOR

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/22/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/04/2018:CIVIL COVER SHEET

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PALM BEACH COUNTY'S OFFER OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SECTION 73.032, FLORIDA STATUTES F/B DFT LB SILVER LLC; Notes:OF ACCEPTANCE OF PALM BEACH COUNTY'S OFFER OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SECTION 73.032, FLORIDA STATUTES F/B DFT LB SILVER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER J NUTT DTD 7/15/19: SUBSTITUTING PARTY DFT - GRANTED. PRINSBANK SUBSTITUTED FOR WELLS FARGO BANK NA.; Notes:J NUTT DTD 7/15/19: SUBSTITUTING PARTY DFT - GRANTED. PRINSBANK SUBSTITUTED FOR WELLS FARGO BANK NA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL; Notes:NUTT DTD 7/09/2019 AS TO PARCELS 125 AND 325 ONLY. THIS ACTION IS SET FOR JURY TRIAL FROM JANUARY 21, 2020 THROUGH FEBRUARY 28, 2020 COURTROOM 11A. CALENDAR CALL IS JANUARY 10, 2020 @ 9:00 AM COURTROOM 11E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE F/B PETITIONER; Notes:TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE F/B PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO LB SILVER, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL; Notes:(AMENDED) TO SET CAUSE AS TO PARCELS 125 AND 325 ONLY F/B DFT **UP 7/2/2019**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL; Notes:AS TO PARCELES 125 AND 135 ONLY F/B DFT LB SILVER LLC UP 7/2/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING OFFER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SECTION 73.032 FLORIDA STATUTES F/B PETITIONER; Notes:OF SERVING OFFER JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO SECTION 73.032 FLORIDA STATUTES F/B PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DFT - F/B DFT WELLS FARGO BANK NA; Notes:FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY DFT - F/B DFT WELLS FARGO BANK NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING 08/23/2019 11:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • Due Date:01/22/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Due Date:01/22/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Due Date:01/22/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Due Date:01/22/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Due Date:01/22/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Due Date:01/22/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$17.50; Amount Paid:$17.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$108.00; Amount Paid:$108.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Due Date:12/06/2018; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less