Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/18/2021 at 21:59:42 (UTC).

PALM BEACH COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA BY AND THROUGH ITS BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS V SILVIA ALEJANDRA VIDAL

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 PALM BEACH COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA BY AND THROUGH ITS BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SILVIA ALEJANDRA VIDAL. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SURBER , MELANIE D and CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SURBER , MELANIE D

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PALM BEACH COUNTY A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA BY AND THROUGH ITS BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

Defendants and Respondents

TOWN OF LANTANA FLORIDA

SILVIA ALEJANDRA VIDAL

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SILVA ALEJANDRA VIDAL

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

TOP LEGACY PROPERTIES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GLASSER , EVAN S

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PORR JR ESQ, WALTER H

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/02/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/12/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $12.50 ON RECEIPT 3871186

01/12/2021:PAID $12.50 ON RECEIPT 3871186

NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING OF COURT ORDER

12/07/2020:NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING OF COURT ORDER

MOTION TO SET ASIDE

11/25/2020:MOTION TO SET ASIDE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/24/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE FB PLT/ OF SERVING OF COURT ORDER

11/20/2020:NOTICE FB PLT/ OF SERVING OF COURT ORDER

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

03/06/2020:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

ANSWER

03/05/2020:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/17/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $460.10 ON RECEIPT 3518454

02/03/2020:PAID $460.10 ON RECEIPT 3518454

COMPLAINT

01/30/2020:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING

01/30/2020:NOTICE OF FILING

PAID $360.10 ON RECEIPT 3518454

01/31/2020:PAID $360.10 ON RECEIPT 3518454

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE TOP LEGACY PROPERTIES, LLC - 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3871186; Receipt Amount: $12.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$472.60; total Amount Paid:$472.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/12/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:01/12/2021; Description:4XDT Additional DFT over 5: $2.50; Amount Due:$2.50; Amount Paid:$2.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Karissa.chin-duncan@gmlaw.com;Acct-FLCourteFilingPortalPayments@gmlaw.com;AllResidentialForeclosureStaff@gmlaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $12.50 ON RECEIPT 3871186; Notes:$12.50 3871186 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE UPDATE CLERK NAME. IT IS NOW JOSEPH ABRUZZO; Notes:Karissa.chin-duncan@gmlaw.com;Acct-FLCourteFilingPortalPayments@gmlaw.com;AllResidentialForeclosureStaff@gmlaw.com PLEASE UPDATE CLERK NAME. IT IS NOW JOSEPH ABRUZZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING OF COURT ORDER; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING OF COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:TO AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B DEFT TOWN OF LANTANA, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Evan.Glasser@gmlaw.com;Acct-FLCourteFilingPortalPayments@gmlaw.com;AllResidentialForeclosureStaff@gmlaw.com SUMMONS E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Evan.Glasser@gmlaw.com;Acct-FLCourteFilingPortalPayments@gmlaw.com;AllResidentialForeclosureStaff@gmlaw.com SUMMONS E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Evan.Glasser@gmlaw.com;Acct-FLCourteFilingPortalPayments@gmlaw.com;AllResidentialForeclosureStaff@gmlaw.com SUMMONS E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Evan.Glasser@gmlaw.com;Acct-FLCourteFilingPortalPayments@gmlaw.com;AllResidentialForeclosureStaff@gmlaw.com SUMMONS E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:OF COMPLIANCE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE CLAIM F/ B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 31197 PAGE 1617-1617; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TOWN OF LANTANA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Glasser