This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/06/2022 at 19:37:22 (UTC).

PAHOKEE HOUSING AUTHORITY, INC V MURRAY, MONTAIN JR

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 PAHOKEE HOUSING AUTHORITY, INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MURRAY, MONTAIN JR. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PAHOKEE HOUSING AUTHORITY, INC

Respondents and Defendants

BOYCE , SHAMEKA

MURRAY JR, MONTAIN

 

Court Documents

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4515861

06/27/2022:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4515861

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

06/27/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

06/27/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/29/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/29/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/01/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/01/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4529435

07/08/2022:PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4529435

ANSWER

07/08/2022:ANSWER

ORDER SETTING HEARING

07/15/2022:ORDER SETTING HEARING

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: MEDIATION & FINAL HEARING ON AUG 9 2022 @ 1:30 PM -JUDGE ALIJEWICZ 7/15/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4529435; Receipt Amount: $515.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $720.00; total Amount Paid: $720.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/08/2022; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $15.00; Amount Paid: $15.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/08/2022; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $500.00; Amount Paid: $500.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: F/B DFT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4529435; Notes: $515.00 4529435 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO MONTAIN MURRAY JR SERVED ON 06/29/2022 VIA SUB SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO SHAMEKA BOYCE SERVED ON 06/29/2022 VIA SUB SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4515861; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/27/2022; Description: Summons $10.00; Amount Due: $20.00; Amount Paid: $20.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/27/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4515861; Notes: $205.00 4515861 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAHOKEE HOUSING AUTHORITY, INC. is a litigant