This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/16/2023 at 01:05:16 (UTC).

ORTHO FLORIDA, LLC D/B/A BOCA RATON ORTHOPAEDIC GROUP, INC. (PATIENT ANNETTE SEAMAN) V GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 ORTHO FLORIDA, LLC D/B/A BOCA RATON ORTHOPAEDIC GROUP, INC PATIENT ANNETTE SEAMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SILVER , ORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SILVER , ORI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ORTHO FLORIDA, LLC D/B/A BOCA RATON ORTHOPAEDIC GROUP, INC. (PATIENT: ANNETTE SEAMAN)

Defendant and Respondent

GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

PRINCE , MICHAEL RYAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/26/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/26/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/26/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4758356

01/27/2023:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4758356

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/27/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/24/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

03/14/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUBSTITUTE GREAT NORTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY - 02/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4758356; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/27/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/27/2023; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@GEDLAWYERS.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 3/14/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 3/14/2023 9:30 AM SILVER, ORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4758356; Notes: $90.00 4758356 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less