This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/01/2023 at 17:21:50 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC V SANCHES, GUSTAVO CHAVIS

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SANCHES, GUSTAVO CHAVIS. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant and Respondent

SANCHES , GUSTAVO CHAVIS

Lake Worth, FL 33463

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LOBELLO III, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/12/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/12/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

01/12/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4741855

01/13/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4741855

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/13/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 4C (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4741855; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/13/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/13/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MAIL@ROLFELAW.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 2/14/2023 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 2/14/2023 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4741855; Notes: $310.00 4741855 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less