This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 15:26:33 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC V BECKER, MICHELE B

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BECKER, MICHELE B. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF AMERICA INC

Defendant and Respondent

BECKER , MICHELE B

Jupiter, FL 33458

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

LOBELLO III, THOMAS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/29/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

06/29/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4520769

06/30/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4520769

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/27/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER OF DEFAULT

08/02/2022:ORDER OF DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6K (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT; Notes: JUDGE GARRISON ON 8/2/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MICHELE B. BECKER - 07/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4520769; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/30/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/30/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MAIL@ROLFELAW.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 8/2/2022 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 8/2/2022 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4520769; Notes: $310.00 4520769 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lobello, Thomas, III