This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/17/2023 at 01:03:57 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION V PEREZ RODRIGUEZ, SANDY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEREZ RODRIGUEZ, SANDY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION

Defendant and Respondent

PEREZ RODRIGUEZ , SANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ROLFE ESQ, AMANDA C

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/01/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

02/01/2023:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4764719

02/02/2023:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4764719

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4764719

02/14/2023:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4764719

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

03/07/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

03/15/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PARTIES NO APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF NON-SERVICE SANDY PEREZ RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4764719; Receipt Amount: $320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4764719; Notes: $310.00 4764719 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 4764719; Notes: 4764719

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/02/2023; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: MAIL@ROLFELAW.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 3/15/2023 1:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 3/15/2023 1:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4764719; Notes: $320.00 4764719 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less