This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/09/2021 at 21:10:42 (UTC).

ONE SOUTH DIXIE INVESTORS LLC V FLUENT SERVICING LLC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 ONE SOUTH DIXIE INVESTORS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLUENT SERVICING LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTZ , JAMES L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARTZ , JAMES L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ONE SOUTH DIXIE INVESTORS LLC

Defendants and Respondents

FLUENT SERVICING LLC

CANSORTIUM HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JONES , JOSEPH P

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BEASLEY , ROBERT O

PUGH , PHILLIP A

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 31708 PAGE 1301-1302

08/28/2020:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 31708 PAGE 1301-1302

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/26/2020:MOTION TO DISMISS

AGREED ORDER MARTZ; ON DFT'S MOTION TO DETERERMINE RENT AND CANCELING HEARING; TENANT SHALL FULLY COMPLY WITH SECTION 83.232 FLORIDA STATUTES BY DEPOSITING THE SUM OF $45,115.96 IN THE COURT REGISTRY BY THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON 8/20/2020 AND DEPOSITI

08/13/2020:AGREED ORDER MARTZ; ON DFT'S MOTION TO DETERERMINE RENT AND CANCELING HEARING; TENANT SHALL FULLY COMPLY WITH SECTION 83.232 FLORIDA STATUTES BY DEPOSITING THE SUM OF $45,115.96 IN THE COURT REGISTRY BY THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON 8/20/2020 AND DEPOSITING IN THE COURT REGISTRY THE SUM OF $33,436.58 ON THE 1ST BUSINESS DAY OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER COMMENCING 9/1/2020; TENANT'S FAILURE TO FULLY COMPLY WITH THIS AGREED ORDER SHALL BE DEEMED AN ABSOLUTE WAIVER OF TENANT'S DEFENESE TO COUNT I OF THE COMPLANT; DFT ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINT IS STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE RIGHT OF REFILE IF TENANT MAKES THE COURT REGISTRY DEPOSIT DUE ON 8/20/2020; PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPELD DEPOSIT OF RENT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 83.232 IS DENIED AS MOOT; THE SPECIAL SET HEARING TO CONSIDER THE MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 8/13/2020 @11AM IS CANCELLED DTD 8/13/2020

MOTION UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME (F/B DFT FLUENT SERVICING)

08/06/2020:MOTION UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME (F/B DFT FLUENT SERVICING)

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/06/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

WITNESS LIST

08/06/2020:WITNESS LIST

RESPONSE TO: DFTS MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSIT OF RENT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 83.232 F/B PLT

08/06/2020:RESPONSE TO: DFTS MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSIT OF RENT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 83.232 F/B PLT

WITNESS LIST

08/06/2020:WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

08/05/2020:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

ORDER SETTING HEARING

08/04/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING

MOTION TO STRIKE

08/03/2020:MOTION TO STRIKE

MOTION TENANT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

07/31/2020:MOTION TENANT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/30/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/30/2020:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/30/2020:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NOTICE OF FILING

07/23/2020:NOTICE OF FILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/23/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/16/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketDISPOSED BEFORE OTHER; Notes:DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 31708 PAGE 1301-1302; Notes:J MARTZ DTD. 8/28/20 ACTION IS DISMISSED. DBO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE - F/B PLT & DFT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER MARTZ; ON DFT'S MOTION TO DETERERMINE RENT AND CANCELING HEARING; TENANT SHALL FULLY COMPLY WITH SECTION 83.232 FLORIDA STATUTES BY DEPOSITING THE SUM OF $45,115.96 IN THE COURT REGISTRY BY THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON 8/20/2020 AND DEPOSITING IN THE COURT REGISTRY THE SUM OF $33,436.58 ON THE 1ST BUSINESS DAY OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER COMMENCING 9/1/2020; TENANT'S FAILURE TO FULLY COMPLY WITH THIS AGREED ORDER SHALL BE DEEMED AN ABSOLUTE WAIVER OF TENANT'S DEFENESE TO COUNT I OF THE COMPLANT; DFT ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINT IS STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE RIGHT OF REFILE IF TENANT MAKES THE COURT REGISTRY DEPOSIT DUE ON 8/20/2020; PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPELD DEPOSIT OF RENT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 83.232 IS DENIED AS MOOT; THE SPECIAL SET HEARING TO CONSIDER THE MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 8/13/2020 @11AM IS CANCELLED DTD 8/13/2020; Notes:MARTZ; ON DFT'S MOTION TO DETERERMINE RENT AND CANCELING HEARING; TENANT SHALL FULLY COMPLY WITH SECTION 83.232 FLORIDA STATUTES BY DEPOSITING THE SUM OF $45,115.96 IN THE COURT REGISTRY BY THE CLOSE OF BUSINESS ON 8/20/2020 AND DEPOSITING IN THE COURT REGISTRY THE SUM OF $33,436.58 ON THE 1ST BUSINESS DAY OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER COMMENCING 9/1/2020; TENANT'S FAILURE TO FULLY COMPLY WITH THIS AGREED ORDER SHALL BE DEEMED AN ABSOLUTE WAIVER OF TENANT'S DEFENESE TO COUNT I OF THE COMPLANT; DFT ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINT IS STRICKEN WITHOUT PREJUDICE WITH THE RIGHT OF REFILE IF TENANT MAKES THE COURT REGISTRY DEPOSIT DUE ON 8/20/2020; PLTF'S MOTION TO COMPELD DEPOSIT OF RENT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 83.232 IS DENIED AS MOOT; THE SPECIAL SET HEARING TO CONSIDER THE MOTION SCHEDULED FOR 8/13/2020 @11AM IS CANCELLED DTD 8/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME (F/B DFT FLUENT SERVICING); Notes:UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME (F/B DFT FLUENT SERVICING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSIT OF RENT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES, SECTION 83.232

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:UNOPPOSED FOR A 1-DAY TO DELIVER HARD COPY OF HEARING MATERIALS TO COURT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS LIST; Notes:AND EXHIBIT LIST FOR AUGUST 13, 2020 HEARING F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: DFTS MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSIT OF RENT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 83.232 F/B PLT; Notes:DFTS MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSIT OF RENT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 83.232 F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS LIST; Notes:TENANT'S WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST FOR AUGUST 13, 2020 HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jjones@bergersingerman.com;drt@bergersingerman.com;rperez@bergersingerman.com AS TO DFT FLUENT SERVICING LLC FKA KNOX SERVICING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jjones@bergersingerman.com;drt@bergersingerman.com;rperez@bergersingerman.com AS TO DFT CANSORTIUM HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3684982; Notes:$421.00 3684982 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Notes:B F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Notes:A F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE CORRECT CLERK OF COURT AND COURT HEADING; Notes:jjones@bergersingerman.com;drt@bergersingerman.com;rperez@bergersingerman.com PLEASE CORRECT CLERK OF COURT AND COURT HEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE CORRECT CLERK OF COURT AND COURT HEADING; Notes:jjones@bergersingerman.com;drt@bergersingerman.com;rperez@bergersingerman.com PLEASE CORRECT CLERK OF COURT AND COURT HEADING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLUENT SERVICING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOSEPH P JONES