This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 10/30/2019 at 19:53:22 (UTC).

OLSHAN, MELVIN V PLATINA COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATIONS INC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 OLSHAN, MELVIN filed an Other lawsuit against PLATINA COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATIONS INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

OLSHAN , MELVIN

Respondents and Defendants

PLATINA COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATIONS INC

ILLUSTRE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

COHEN , LEE P

TOLLEY , RAMONA L

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/25/2019:COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/25/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/25/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3346470

09/27/2019:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3346470

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/23/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/23/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

10/24/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/24/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/24/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

10/25/2019:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

10/28/2019:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLT'S COMPLAINT (F/B DFT ILLUSTRE VILLAGE CONDO. ASSOC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FILED BY ATTY TOLLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT PLATINA COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATION, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:AND NOTICE OF APPERANCE AND DISCLOSURE F/B M PHILLIPS OBO DFT PLATINA COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3346470; Notes:$421.00 3346470 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:info@cohennewmark.com;nrs@cohennewmark.com;rt@cohennewmark.com AS TO DFT PLANTINA COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATION INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:info@cohennewmark.com;nrs@cohennewmark.com;rt@cohennewmark.com AS TO DFT ILLUSTRE IVILLAGE CONDOMINIUM INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DFT PLATINA COMMUNITY MASTER ASSOCIATIONS INC - F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DFT ILLUSTRE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC - F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketReceipt Number:3346470; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDue Date:09/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDue Date:09/27/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketDue Date:09/27/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less