This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/20/2022 at 19:02:25 (UTC).

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 V WINFREE, CLAIRE

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WINFREE, CLAIRE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURKE , LAUREN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURKE , LAUREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704

Defendant and Respondent

WINFREE , CLAIRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/11/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4643014

10/12/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4643014

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/17/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RESPONSE TO: EVICTION CASE. FB DFT

10/19/2022:RESPONSE TO: EVICTION CASE. FB DFT

ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY DTD: 10/20/22 JUDGE BURKE

10/20/2022:ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY DTD: 10/20/22 JUDGE BURKE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/28/2022:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

10/28/2022:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/02/2022:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/14/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: CLAIRE WINFREE 11/4/22 EXECUTED 11/7/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes: FWD TO PBSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33934 PAGE 785-785; Notes: FOR POSSESSION AND ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK TO CLOSE THE FILE- JUDGE BURKE DTD 10/27/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: DEFAULT OF EVICTION FOR DEFENDANT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RENT DEPOSIT ORDER F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED CLAIRE WINFREE CLAIRE WINDFREE - 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY DTD: 10/20/22 JUDGE BURKE; Notes: DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY DTD: 10/20/22 JUDGE BURKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: EVICTION CASE. FB DFT; Notes: EVICTION CASE. FB DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4643014; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/12/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/12/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4643014; Notes: $195.00 4643014 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less