This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/21/2023 at 19:05:14 (UTC).

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 V WALKER, YHETTA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WALKER, YHETTA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704

Defendant and Respondent

WALKER , YHETTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/12/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/12/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/12/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4741260

01/12/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4741260

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/18/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/23/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION TO STRIKE

01/31/2023:MOTION TO STRIKE

ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT(S) TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY - SIGNED JUDGE GARRISON 2/1/2023

02/01/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT(S) TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY - SIGNED JUDGE GARRISON 2/1/2023

PAID $412.00 ON RECEIPT 4776294

02/13/2023:PAID $412.00 ON RECEIPT 4776294

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/14/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

PAID $616.50 ON RECEIPT 4780643

02/15/2023:PAID $616.50 ON RECEIPT 4780643

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/15/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4780643; Receipt Amount: $616.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,223.50; total Amount Paid: $1,223.50; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/15/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $16.50; Amount Paid: $16.50; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/15/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $600.00; Amount Paid: $600.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: FILED BY DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $616.50 ON RECEIPT 4780643; Notes: $616.50 4780643 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: DEFAULT -OF EVICTION FOR DFTS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RENT DEPOSIT ORDER F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4776294; Receipt Amount: $412.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/13/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $12.00; Amount Paid: $12.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/13/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $400.00; Amount Paid: $400.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: YHETTA WALKER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED YHETTA WALKER - 01/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4741260; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/12/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/12/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4741260; Notes: $195.00 4741260 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less