This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/13/2023 at 19:00:53 (UTC).

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 V WALKER, ARSADIA

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WALKER, ARSADIA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704

Defendant and Respondent

WALKER , ARSADIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KENNEDY , RASHIDA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/04/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/04/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/04/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4732452

01/05/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4732452

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/10/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY F/B DFT

01/12/2023:MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY F/B DFT

ANSWER

01/12/2023:ANSWER

PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4743057

01/13/2023:PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4743057

PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4743057

01/13/2023:PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4743057

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/13/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4749320

01/20/2023:PAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4749320

ORDER SETTING HEARING

01/20/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

ORDER RELEASING FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY - JUDGE TEW 2/2/23

02/09/2023:ORDER RELEASING FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY - JUDGE TEW 2/2/23

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

02/09/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34118 PAGE 1409-1408

02/09/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34118 PAGE 1409-1408

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34118 PAGE 1409-1408; Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PAYMENT WITH FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION AND/OR DAMAGES UPON DEFAULT ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT OF ANY REGISTRY DEPOSITS AND DIRECTING THE CLERK TO CLOSE THE FILE - JUDGE TE 2/8/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: BOTH PARTIES PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RELEASING FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY - JUDGE TEW 2/2/23; Notes: RELEASING FUNDS FROM COURT REGISTRY - JUDGE TEW 2/2/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4749320; Receipt Amount: $515.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $1,225.00; total Amount Paid: $1,225.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/20/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $15.00; Amount Paid: $15.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/20/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $500.00; Amount Paid: $500.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: MANDATORY MEDIATION AND DETERMINATION OF RENT 2/2/23 AT 2:30 PM COURTROOM 6J SIGNED BY JUDGE TEW ON 1/20/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $515.00 ON RECEIPT 4749320; Notes: $515.00 4749320 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY F/B DFT; Notes: TO DETERMINE AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4732452; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/05/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/05/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4732452; Notes: $195.00 4732452 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less