This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 12/11/2022 at 19:09:54 (UTC).

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 V MARCH, KERIANA

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARCH, KERIANA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704

Defendant and Respondent

MARCH , KERIANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/01/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

11/01/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/01/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4667224

11/02/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4667224

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4704900

12/08/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4704900

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4704900; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 12/08/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4704900; Notes: $10.00 4704900 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com AS TO KERINA MARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4667224; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/02/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4667224; Notes: $185.00 4667224 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less