This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/21/2023 at 19:05:38 (UTC).

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 V HENRY, CLAUDIA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HENRY, CLAUDIA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704

Defendant and Respondent

HENRY , CLAUDIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

REINER , MARC

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT

02/10/2023:EXHIBIT

RESPONSE TO: PLT'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT F/B DFT

02/10/2023:RESPONSE TO: PLT'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT F/B DFT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/10/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER TO FILE CASE STATUS REPORT JUDGE TEW ON 2/9/23

02/09/2023:ORDER TO FILE CASE STATUS REPORT JUDGE TEW ON 2/9/23

EXHIBIT

02/09/2023:EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

02/09/2023:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

PAID $3,086.12 ON RECEIPT 4772820

02/09/2023:PAID $3,086.12 ON RECEIPT 4772820

ORDER GRANTING IN PART DFT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT & DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY -JUDGE TEW 2/03/23

02/03/2023:ORDER GRANTING IN PART DFT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT & DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY -JUDGE TEW 2/03/23

EXHIBIT

02/03/2023:EXHIBIT

EXHIBIT

02/03/2023:EXHIBIT

EMERGENCY MOTION

02/03/2023:EMERGENCY MOTION

CLERK'S DEFAULT

02/02/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

01/31/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/31/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING

01/31/2023:NOTICE OF FILING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/31/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/23/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/18/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Notes: COPY OF EMAIL F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: PLT'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT F/B DFT; Notes: PLT'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: OF EVICTION FOR DFTS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RENT DEPOSIT ORDER F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4772820; Receipt Amount: $3,086.12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $3,281.12; total Amount Paid: $3,281.12; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/09/2023; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $52.50; Amount Paid: $52.50; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/09/2023; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $3,033.62; Amount Paid: $3,033.62; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO FILE CASE STATUS REPORT JUDGE TEW ON 2/9/23; Notes: TO FILE CASE STATUS REPORT JUDGE TEW ON 2/9/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT; Notes: FB PLT-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Notes: FB DFT- WITH COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: CLAUDIA HENRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED CLAUDIA HENRY - 01/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4741171; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/12/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/12/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4741171; Notes: $195.00 4741171 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less