This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/21/2023 at 19:05:30 (UTC).

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 V DAVIS, DARLINE

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVIS, DARLINE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704

Defendants and Respondents

DAVIS , DARLINE

DAVIS , LESLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/12/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/12/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/12/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/12/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4741205

01/12/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4741205

ANSWER

01/18/2023:ANSWER

PAID $6.90 ON RECEIPT 4746052

01/18/2023:PAID $6.90 ON RECEIPT 4746052

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/18/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/18/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE CASTOR ON 1/20/23

01/20/2023:ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE CASTOR ON 1/20/23

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/23/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/23/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAID $1.35 ON RECEIPT 4759959

01/30/2023:PAID $1.35 ON RECEIPT 4759959

ORDER SETTING HEARING

01/30/2023:ORDER SETTING HEARING

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/31/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34126 PAGE 414-413

02/14/2023:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34126 PAGE 414-413

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

02/14/2023:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: BOTH PARTIES PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 34126 PAGE 414-413; Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PAYMENT WITH FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION AND/OR DAMAGES UPON DEFAULT, ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT OF ANY REGISTRY DEPOSITS AND DIRECTING THE CLERK TO CLOSE THE FILE - JUDGE CASTOR 2/14/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: OF EVICTION FOR DEFENDANT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RENT DEPOSIT ORDER. F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4759959; Receipt Amount: $1.35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $213.25; total Amount Paid: $213.25; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/30/2023; Description: CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $1.35; Amount Paid: $1.35; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: MANDATORY MEDIATION AND DETERMINATION OF RENT ON 2/14/23 AT 9:45 AM COURTROOM 4C SIGNED BY JUDGE CASTOR ON 1/30/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $1.35 ON RECEIPT 4759959; Notes: $1.35 4759959 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: TO THE ORDER DIRECTING TO DEPOSIT ; F/B DFT; Notes: TO THE ORDER DIRECTING TO DEPOSIT ; F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4741205; Receipt Amount: $205.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/12/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/12/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/12/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4741205; Notes: $205.00 4741205 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less