This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 11/20/2022 at 19:01:46 (UTC).

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 V CADEAU, YANNIQUE

Case Summary

On 10/11/2022 NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CADEAU, YANNIQUE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NXRTBH BAYBERRY, LLC DBA SEASONS 704

Defendant and Respondent

CADEAU , YANNIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/11/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/11/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4643102

10/12/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4643102

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/17/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $2,306.02 ON RECEIPT 4654949

10/21/2022:PAID $2,306.02 ON RECEIPT 4654949

ANSWER

10/21/2022:ANSWER

MOTION TO ENFORCE FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 83.60 F/B PLT

10/24/2022:MOTION TO ENFORCE FLORIDA STATUTES SECTION 83.60 F/B PLT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

10/24/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY DTD: 10/26/22 JUDGE GARRISON

10/26/2022:ORDER DIRECTING DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO COURT REGISTRY DTD: 10/26/22 JUDGE GARRISON

EMERGENCY MOTION

11/04/2022:EMERGENCY MOTION

ORDER GRANTING DFT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ACCEPT DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY **JUDGE SARA ALIJEWICZ 11/04/2022**

11/04/2022:ORDER GRANTING DFT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ACCEPT DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY **JUDGE SARA ALIJEWICZ 11/04/2022**

PAID $1,876.50 ON RECEIPT 4670975

11/04/2022:PAID $1,876.50 ON RECEIPT 4670975

ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT(S) TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY - SIGNED JUDGE GARRISON 11/7/2022

11/07/2022:ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT(S) TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY - SIGNED JUDGE GARRISON 11/7/2022

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT(S) TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY - SIGNED JUDGE GARRISON 11/7/2022; Notes: DIRECTING DEFENDANT(S) TO DEPOSIT ADDITIONAL FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY - SIGNED JUDGE GARRISON 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4670975; Receipt Amount: $34.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4670975; Receipt Amount: $842.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4670975; Receipt Amount: $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $4,377.52; total Amount Paid: $4,377.52; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/04/2022; Description: Other Registry Fee PB; Amount Due: $34.50; Amount Paid: $34.50; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/04/2022; Description: Other Registry Deposit PB; Amount Due: $1,842.00; Amount Paid: $1,842.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $1,876.50 ON RECEIPT 4670975; Notes: $1,876.50 4670975 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DFT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ACCEPT DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY **JUDGE SARA ALIJEWICZ 11/04/2022**; Notes: GRANTING DFT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ACCEPT DEPOSIT INTO REGISTRY **JUDGE SARA ALIJEWICZ 11/04/2022**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION; Notes: F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED YANNIQUE CADEAU - 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4643102; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/12/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/12/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4643102; Notes: $195.00 4643102 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less