This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/02/2022 at 15:42:42 (UTC).

NOVA ORTHO AND SPINE PLLC V GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 NOVA ORTHO AND SPINE PLLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NOVA ORTHO AND SPINE PLLC

Respondent and Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALK , KENNETH B

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

LONG , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/23/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4515828

06/27/2022:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4515828

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/27/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/12/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUBSTITUTE GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY - 07/08/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4515828; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $90.00; total Amount Paid: $90.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/27/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/27/2022; Description: 402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due: $80.00; Amount Paid: $80.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM FOR DFT, E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 8/2/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 8/2/2022 9:30 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4515828; Notes: $90.00 4515828 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: FB PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOVA ORTHO AND SPINE PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALK ESQ, KENNETH B