This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/11/2023 at 19:05:19 (UTC).

NORTHLAND LUGANO LLC, DBA VIA LUGANO V ANESES, MONICA

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 NORTHLAND LUGANO LLC, DBA VIA LUGANO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANESES, MONICA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NORTHLAND LUGANO LLC, DBA VIA LUGANO

Defendants and Respondents

ANESES , MONICA

HARVIN , JAHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SIEGEL , MATTHEW E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/30/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4761434

01/31/2023:PAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4761434

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/13/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/13/2023:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

02/23/2023:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

AFFIDAVIT

02/23/2023:AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT

02/23/2023:AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/23/2023:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

02/23/2023:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/23/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/23/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CLERK'S DEFAULT

03/01/2023:CLERK'S DEFAULT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

03/06/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

03/06/2023:E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED DUPLICATE FILING; Notes: SAME AS DE 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: ESERVICE@MGFDLAW.COM TO MONICA ANESES AND JAHI HARVIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: JAHI HARVIN, POSTED 2/8/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: MONICA ANESES, POSTED 2/8/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: BY CLERK F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: PLTS VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: COUNSELS VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $205.00 ON RECEIPT 4761434; Notes: $205.00 4761434 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@mgfdlaw.com MONICA ANESES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@mgfdlaw.com JAHI HARVIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less