This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/20/2021 at 15:04:21 (UTC).

NORMANDY M ASSOCIATION INC V THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, OR OTHER CLAIMANTS BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST LEON BRAM (DECEASED)

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 NORMANDY M ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, OR OTHER CLAIMANTS BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST LEON BRAM DECEASED. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PARNOFIELLO , JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NORMANDY M ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

BRAM , MARK

MAMMOTH RESTORATION OF FLORIDA LLC

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, LIENORS, CREDITORS, TRUSTEES, OR OTHER CLAIMANTS BY, THROUGH, UNDER OR AGAINST LEON BRAM (DECEASED)

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BAIR , JACOB

Other Attorneys

KEVIN MCNAMARA, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/16/2021:COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

07/16/2021:LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $345.60 ON RECEIPT 4110944

07/21/2021:PAID $345.60 ON RECEIPT 4110944

MOTION EX PARTE TO APPOINT ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM F/B PLT

07/22/2021:MOTION EX PARTE TO APPOINT ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM F/B PLT

ORDER APPOINTING GDN AD LITEM

07/27/2021:ORDER APPOINTING GDN AD LITEM

RETURNED MAIL

08/10/2021:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

08/10/2021:RETURNED MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes:THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING GDN AD LITEM; Notes:ATTORNEY AND ADMINISTRATOR -JUDGE PARNOFIELLO 7/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION EX PARTE TO APPOINT ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM F/B PLT; Notes:EX PARTE TO APPOINT ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:OF LEON BRAM F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4110944; Receipt Amount: $345.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$345.60; total Amount Paid:$345.60; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/21/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/21/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/21/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/21/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $345.60 ON RECEIPT 4110944; Notes:$345.60 4110944 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jbair@blawgroup.com;service@blawgroup.com;cdreher@blawgroup.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jbair@blawgroup.com;service@blawgroup.com;cdreher@blawgroup.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jbair@blawgroup.com;service@blawgroup.com;cdreher@blawgroup.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jbair@blawgroup.com;service@blawgroup.com;cdreher@blawgroup.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32714 PAGE 827-827; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:LIEN FORECLOSURE-E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNAMARA, KEVIN