This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/11/2022 at 22:41:52 (UTC).

NEUROSURGICAL CONSULTANTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA LLC V UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 NEUROSURGICAL CONSULTANTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

NEUROSURGICAL CONSULTANTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA LLC

Defendant and Respondent

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/02/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

05/02/2022:COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/02/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/02/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

05/02/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4451509

05/04/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4451509

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/09/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FED CRT

06/06/2022:NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FED CRT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED - OTHER; Notes: DO - DISPOSED OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDO NOT DOCKET ON THIS CASE; Notes: **** CASE REMOVED TO FEDERAL COURT****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FED CRT; Notes: F/B DFT UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC PROFIT CORPORATION D/B/A UNITEDHEALTHCARE - 05/05/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4451509; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/04/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/04/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4451509; Notes: $411.00 4451509 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: Eric@ECanterLaw.com;Naomi@ECanterLaw.com ISSUED TO UNITED HEALTHCARE EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEUROSURGICAL CONSULTANTS OF SOUTH FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant