This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 03/03/2022 at 09:49:18 (UTC).

NEUHOFF, LOUISE H

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 NEUHOFF, LOUISE H was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLER , KAREN M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MILLER , KAREN M

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

Decedent

NEUHOFF , LOUISE H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

VOGELSANG , STEPHEN G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SRV NOT TO CREDITORS; Notes:PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Notes:DOP FEB 2, 2022 F/B THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO EXTEND TIME; Notes:FOR FILING INVENTORY F/B THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FED EST TAX RTRN DUE; Notes:F/B THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST; Notes:SIGNED BY NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY EMAILED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 33275 PAGE 510-510; Notes:MILLER: DTD 1-26-22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL; Notes:ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND CODICIL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE S/B JUDGE MILLER ON 1/26/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ALLOW NOTARY ACCESS TO CODICIL IN CLERKS OFFICE SIGNED BY JUDGE MILLER ON DEC 30, 2021; Notes:MOTION TO ALLOW NOTARY ACCESS TO CODICIL IN CLERKS OFFICE SIGNED BY JUDGE MILLER ON DEC 30, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO ALLOW NOTARY ACCESS TO CIDICIL IN CLERKS OFFICE; Notes:TO ALLOW NOTARY ACCESS TO CIDICIL IN CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketWILL; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCLERK NOTICE NOT CONFIDENTIAL; Notes:DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4270299; Notes:$401.00 4270299 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:II: North Branch Probate, MH, Guardianship - II (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDOCKET NBR ASSIGNED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE PRODUCTION OF CODICIL BY CUSTODIAN F/B PETR; Notes:PRODUCTION OF CODICIL BY CUSTODIAN F/B PETR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY. VOGELSANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:F/B THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketOATH; Notes:OF CORPORATE P.R. F/B THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B THE NORTHERN TRUST COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Northern Trust Company is a litigant