This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 22:47:18 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC V NUNEZ, ELIO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NUNEZ, ELIO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants and Respondents

CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA

NUNEZ , ELIO

PALM BEACH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIO NUNEZ

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CITIBANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DELUCA , ORLANDO

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

JACKSON , COLLIN D

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/31/2023:COMPLAINT

LIS PENDENS

01/31/2023:LIS PENDENS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $979.10 ON RECEIPT 4763320

02/01/2023:PAID $979.10 ON RECEIPT 4763320

MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY

02/27/2023:MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY

ANSWER

03/01/2023:ANSWER

ORDER NUTT: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION TO ADD DEFENDANT TO ACTION. ORIGINAL VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED 1-31-23 IS AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION UPON EXECUTION OF THIS ORDER DTD 3-2-23

03/02/2023:ORDER NUTT: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION TO ADD DEFENDANT TO ACTION. ORIGINAL VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED 1-31-23 IS AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION UPON EXECUTION OF THIS ORDER DTD 3-2-23

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $12.50 ON RECEIPT 4801289

03/03/2023:PAID $12.50 ON RECEIPT 4801289

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4801289; Receipt Amount: $12.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $991.60; total Amount Paid: $991.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/03/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/03/2023; Description: 8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due: $2.50; Amount Paid: $2.50; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $12.50 ON RECEIPT 4801289; Notes: $12.50 4801289 Balance Due: $2.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: odeluca@delucalawgroup.com;service@delucalawgroup.com;krobertson@delucalawgroup.com AS TO DFT CITIBANK NA SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CITIBANK SOUTH DAKOTA NA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER NUTT: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION TO ADD DEFENDANT TO ACTION. ORIGINAL VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED 1-31-23 IS AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION UPON EXECUTION OF THIS ORDER DTD 3-2-23; Notes: NUTT: PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION TO ADD DEFENDANT TO ACTION. ORIGINAL VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT FILED 1-31-23 IS AMENDED BY INTERLINEATION UPON EXECUTION OF THIS ORDER DTD 3-2-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE - F/B CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT & COMPTROLLER PALM BEACH COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT BY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4763320; Receipt Amount: $979.10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: odeluca@delucalawgroup.com;service@delucalawgroup.com;krobertson@delucalawgroup.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ELIO NUNEZ EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: odeluca@delucalawgroup.com;service@delucalawgroup.com;krobertson@delucalawgroup.com ISSUED TO ELIO NUNEZ EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: odeluca@delucalawgroup.com;service@delucalawgroup.com;krobertson@delucalawgroup.com ISSUED TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) NA EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: odeluca@delucalawgroup.com;service@delucalawgroup.com;krobertson@delucalawgroup.com ISSUED TO PALM BEACH COUNTY CLERK OF COURT OBO GIESELA AGUILA EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: odeluca@delucalawgroup.com;service@delucalawgroup.com;krobertson@delucalawgroup.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 2 EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: odeluca@delucalawgroup.com;service@delucalawgroup.com;krobertson@delucalawgroup.com ISSUED TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1 EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 34138 PAGE 67-67; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less