This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/24/2022 at 12:25:37 (UTC).

NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC. AAO LUC PIERRE V UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/03/2021 NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC AAO LUC PIERRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRISTOW , APRIL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRISTOW , APRIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC. AAO LUC PIERRE

Defendant and Respondent

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FETHERHUFF , BRENDA S

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/03/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/03/2021:COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/03/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

09/03/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/03/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS REQUESTED

09/03/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4168355

09/09/2021:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4168355

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/09/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/17/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4168355

09/20/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4168355

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

10/13/2021:NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

10/13/2021:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

10/13/2021:STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32978 PAGE 1691-1692

10/14/2021:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32978 PAGE 1691-1692

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

01/05/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes:FB PLT- WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes:DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32978 PAGE 1691-1692; Notes:UPON NOTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO CLOSE FILE -JUDGE BRISTOW DTD 10/14/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6L (Main Branch)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE; Notes:JUDGE BRISTOW ON 10/13/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes:WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; Notes:F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4168355; Receipt Amount: $320.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4168355; Notes:$310.00 4168355 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketREVISED RECEIPT 4168355; Notes:4168355

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@UFELDERLAW.COM;INFO@UFELDERLAW.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 10/13/2021 1:00 PM BOSSOPARDO, SANDRA; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 10/13/2021 1:00 PM BOSSOPARDO, SANDRA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4168355; Notes:$320.00 4168355 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT- E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DEFENDANT- E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DEFENDANT- E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Water Restoration Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fetherhuff, Brenda S., ESQ