This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/25/2022 at 15:16:25 (UTC).

NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC (A/A/O JOSEPH F. LA FOSSE AND MARLY A. LA FOSSE) V STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC A/A/O JOSEPH F LA FOSSE AND MARLY A LA FOSSE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SURBER , MELANIE D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SURBER , MELANIE D

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

NATIONAL WATER RESTORATION INC (A/A/O JOSEPH F. LA FOSSE AND MARLY A. LA FOSSE)

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

ALTMAN , ALEXIS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

TEJADA , RACHELL

 

Court Documents

STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

05/20/2022:STIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

05/17/2022:ORDER EXTENDING TIME

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/16/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

05/11/2022:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/05/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF FILING

05/05/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

05/03/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/29/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

04/29/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4430122

04/18/2022:PAID $320.00 ON RECEIPT 4430122

SUMMONS REQUESTED

04/15/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/15/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/15/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/15/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/15/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/15/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/15/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: SB; Room: #7 (South Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP/ORD INVOKE CIV PROCEDURE; Notes: JUDGE M SURBER 05/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME; Notes: AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT -JUDGE SURBER 5/17/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: ON 4/26/22 BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE FOR DFT STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: FB PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: AGREED WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND STIPULATION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: FB DFT-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: FB DFT'S ATTY RACHELL TEJADA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: AS TO CLAIMS ADJUSTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: AS TO CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Water Restoration Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Florida Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexis E Altman