This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/13/2021 at 16:57:15 (UTC).

NATIONAL LEGAL STAFFING SUPPORT LLC V HANSON, MACY D

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 NATIONAL LEGAL STAFFING SUPPORT LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HANSON, MACY D. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MARTZ , JAMES L and GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MARTZ , JAMES L

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

NATIONAL LEGAL STAFFING SUPPORT LLC

RESOLVLY LLC

GM LAW FIRM LLC

Defendants and Respondents

LAW OFFICE OF MACY D HANSON PLLC

HANSON , MACY D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SARELSON , MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

REPLY/RESPONSE

02/11/2021:REPLY/RESPONSE

ORDER DENYING GILLMAN; MOTION TO COMPEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MOTION IS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICED DTD 2/9/2021

02/09/2021:ORDER DENYING GILLMAN; MOTION TO COMPEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MOTION IS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICED DTD 2/9/2021

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

01/22/2021:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

01/22/2021:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/22/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/20/2021:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/11/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/10/2020:MOTION TO DISMISS

ORDER SETTING HEARING

12/08/2020:ORDER SETTING HEARING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/20/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/20/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/28/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/28/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3792714

10/28/2020:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3792714

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/26/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

10/26/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/26/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:IN OPPOSITION TO DFTS UNVERIFIED MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING GILLMAN; MOTION TO COMPEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MOTION IS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICED DTD 2/9/2021; Notes:GILLMAN; MOTION TO COMPEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MOTION IS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICED DTD 2/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT; Notes:GILLMAN; DEFAULT IS ENTERED AGAINST DFT THE LAW OFICE OF MACY D HANSON PLLC DTD 2/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF FEBRUARY 4, 2021 MOTION CALENDAR HEARING 2/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRE-NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING 02/09/2021 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 02/04/2021 08:45:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE JURISDICTIONAL DEPOSITION OF MACY HANSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DEFAULT DEFENDANT THE LAW OFFICE OF MACY D. HANSON, PLLC DEFENDANT THE LAW OFFICE OF MACY D. HANSON, PLLC COURT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/28/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/28/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:NOTICE OF TAKING OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF MACY D. HANSON MACY D HANSON 12/16/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3792714; Notes:$421.00 3792714 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:msarelson@sarelson.com;matthew.sarelson@icloud.com AS TO MACY D HANSON EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:msarelson@sarelson.com;matthew.sarelson@icloud.com AS TO THE LAW OFFICE OF MACY D HANSON PLLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GM Law Firm, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S Sarelson Esq