This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 14:25:53 (UTC).

MUNIZ, HECTOR V BRP US INC

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 MUNIZ, HECTOR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRP US INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COATES JR, HOWARD K and KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COATES JR, HOWARD K

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MUNIZ , HECTOR

MUNIZ , IVIS

Respondents and Defendants

BROWARD MOTORSPORTS HOLDINGS LLC

BRP US INC

REC BOAT HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KALLEEL , JOSHUA T

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KLEIN , STEVEN I

CONYERS , RAECHEL TX

SMITH , JEFFREY D

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/19/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/19/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4218551

10/20/2021:PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4218551

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/27/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/27/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER

11/11/2021:ANSWER

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/15/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

11/15/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/15/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/16/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

01/17/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

01/20/2022:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT REC BOAT HOLDING'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT REC BOAT HOLDING'S REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:AMENDED - F/B DFT BRP US INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT BRP US INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:DEFENDANT REC BOAT HOLDINGS, LLC'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:DEFENDANT REC BOAT HOLDINGS, LLC'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:TO COMPLAINT - F/B DFT REC BOAT HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY CONYERS OBO DFT REC BOAT HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - F/B ATTY JEFFREY D SMITH OBO DFT REC BOAT HOLDINGS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4218551; Receipt Amount: $431.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/20/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/20/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/20/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4218551; Notes:$431.00 4218551 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:JKaleel@farahandfarah.com;jkespohl@farahandfarah.com;mlynch@farahandfarah.com AS TO REC BOATING HOLDINGS LLC DBA SCARAB EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:JKaleel@farahandfarah.com;jkespohl@farahandfarah.com;mlynch@farahandfarah.com AS TO BRP US INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:JKaleel@farahandfarah.com;jkespohl@farahandfarah.com;mlynch@farahandfarah.com AS TO BROWARD MOTORSPORTS HOLDINGS LLC DBA BROWARD MOTORSPORTS OF FT. LAUDERDALE EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:AND JURY DEMAND F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broward Motorsports Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRP US INC. is a litigant