This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/18/2023 at 00:52:08 (UTC).

MULLINAX FORD OF PALM BEACH COUNTY LLC V RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS INC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 MULLINAX FORD OF PALM BEACH COUNTY LLC filed an Other lawsuit against RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MULLINAX FORD OF PALM BEACH COUNTY LLC

Defendants and Respondents

HERZOG CONSTRUCTION CORP

RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS INC

STACY AND WITBECK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

REED ESQ, ERIC C

RENTON , BRETT R

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

PASKERT , JEFFREY M

 

Court Documents

ORDER ACCEPTING AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

12/12/2022:ORDER ACCEPTING AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

12/12/2022:AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

12/09/2022:AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/06/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/06/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER GRANTING J GOODMAN DTD 11/14/22 PLTFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO SUBMIT AN AGREED MANDATORY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY 12/11/22.

11/14/2022:ORDER GRANTING J GOODMAN DTD 11/14/22 PLTFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO SUBMIT AN AGREED MANDATORY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY 12/11/22.

MOTION PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

11/11/2022:MOTION PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/03/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4663118

10/28/2022:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4663118

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/24/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/24/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2022:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2022:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/17/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4530087

07/08/2022:PAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4530087

COMPLAINT

07/07/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ACCEPTING AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes: JAIMIE R. GOODMAN 12/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes: AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (DCMAP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes: AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (DCMAP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: OBO DFTS F/B ATTY J PASKERT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: F/B DFTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING J GOODMAN DTD 11/14/22 PLTFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO SUBMIT AN AGREED MANDATORY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY 12/11/22.; Notes: J GOODMAN DTD 11/14/22 PLTFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. THE PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO SUBMIT AN AGREED MANDATORY CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN BY 12/11/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED HERZOG CONTRACTING CORP., DBA HSR CONSTRUCTORS - 10/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4663118; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $451.00; total Amount Paid: $451.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/08/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/08/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/08/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $431.00 ON RECEIPT 4530087; Notes: $431.00 4530087 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ereed@shutts.com;tmartin@shutts.com;akannell@shutts.com ISSUED TO STACY AND EITBECK INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED NAME ON SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH NAME ON COMPLAINT EFILED; Notes: ereed@shutts.com;tmartin@shutts.com;akannell@shutts.com NAME ON SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH NAME ON COMPLAINT EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ereed@shutts.com;tmartin@shutts.com;akannell@shutts.com ISSUED TOGERZOG CONTRACTING CORP EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less