This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 11/06/2022 at 15:12:51 (UTC).

MOSS CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC LLC AAO APRELL CHILDS V GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 MOSS CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC LLC AAO APRELL CHILDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MOSS CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC LLC AAO APRELL CHILDS

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KOPP , TARA L

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

RAMDEO , ANDREA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/27/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS REQUESTED

09/27/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/27/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4628466

09/29/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4628466

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/12/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/19/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/19/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/19/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

10/19/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/24/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

10/27/2022:STIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND ORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL - SIGNED JUDGE SHERMAN 10/28/2022

10/28/2022:ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND ORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL - SIGNED JUDGE SHERMAN 10/28/2022

ORDER SETTING HEARING

11/02/2022:ORDER SETTING HEARING

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes: CMC- 11/30/22@11AM- VIA ZOOM - JUDGE SHERMAN DTD 11/2/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND ORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL - SIGNED JUDGE SHERMAN 10/28/2022; Notes: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND ORDER EXCUSING PARTIES FROM IN PERSON PRE-TRIAL - SIGNED JUDGE SHERMAN 10/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIP INVOKING CIVIL PROCEDURE; Notes: JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS. F/B ATTY ANDREA RAMDEO OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY - 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/29/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: SHWPIP@SHW-LAW.COM EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 11/2/2022 1:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 11/2/2022 1:00 PM SHERMAN, JAMES W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4628466; Notes: $185.00 4628466 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Moss Chiropractic Clinic LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kopp, Tara L