This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/20/2023 at 10:56:40 (UTC).

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC V UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF DOLORES ANN DAILEY DECEASED

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF DOLORES ANN DAILEY DECEASED. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants and Respondents

ILLUSTRE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

SOBEL , BRUCE M

SOBEL , RICHARD G

SOBEL , SCOTT B

SOBEL , STEVEN M

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF DOLORES ANN DAILEY DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STARASOLER , TRACY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SUGARMAN , DEBORAH S

APPELBAUM , STEVEN M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/13/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/29/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

12/22/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/22/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

12/19/2022:CLERK'S DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

12/12/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/12/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/12/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/12/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

09/19/2022:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702.015 CERTIFICATION F/B PLT

09/19/2022:NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702.015 CERTIFICATION F/B PLT

LIS PENDENS BOOK 33857 PAGE 49-49

09/19/2022:LIS PENDENS BOOK 33857 PAGE 49-49

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/19/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/19/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B STEVEN M. APPELBAUM ESQ., THE FIRM OF SAUL EWING LLP AS COUNSEL FOR DFTS BRUCE MARK SOBEL, STEVEN M. SOBEL AND RICHARD GLEN SOBEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING 01/19/2023 08:45:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY HAVE AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF IRVING SOBEL DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTATE OF IRVING SOBEL DECEASED JUDICIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes: FLMAIL@RASLG.COM; RLUMBRERAS@RASLG.COM AS TO BRUCE, STEVEN, RICHARD SOBEL AND US OF AMERICA OBO THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AFFIDAVIT AS TO NON-MILITARY STATUS STEVEN M. SOBEL; BRUCE MARK SOBEL; RICHARD GLEN SOBEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED RICHARD GLEN SOBEL - 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED STEVEN M SOBEL - 09/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BRUCE MARK SOBEL - 09/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com AS TO SCOTT B SOBEL EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com AS TO RICHARD GLEN SOBEL EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com AS TO ILLUSTRE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com AS TO BRUCE MARK SOBEL EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702.015 CERTIFICATION F/B PLT; Notes: OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702.015 CERTIFICATION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33857 PAGE 49-49; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ILLUSTRE VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where MORTGAGE ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Starasoler, Tracy, ESQ.