This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 02/15/2021 at 17:07:16 (UTC).

MONTGOMERY, MATTHEW V WATLEE CONSTRUCTION INC

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 MONTGOMERY, MATTHEW filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WATLEE CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , JANIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , JANIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MONTGOMERY , MATTHEW

Respondent and Defendant

WATLEE CONSTRUCTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

DEL TORO , PETER D

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

GRAZI ESQ, RYAN S

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/11/2021:REQUEST FOR COPIES

CERTIFICATE

02/10/2021:CERTIFICATE

CERTIFICATE

02/10/2021:CERTIFICATE

MOTION TO DISMISS

02/04/2021:MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

01/25/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

01/25/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/21/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/21/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

AGREED ORDER KEYSER DTD 1/7/21: DFT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION GRANTED DFT SHALL RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT BY 2/4/21

01/07/2021:AGREED ORDER KEYSER DTD 1/7/21: DFT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION GRANTED DFT SHALL RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT BY 2/4/21

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

01/04/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

01/04/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

01/04/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/30/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3838652

12/09/2020:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3838652

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/08/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3834617

12/07/2020:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3834617

COMPLAINT

12/03/2020:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/03/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Notes:DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1.351(E)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes:CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FROM DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION FROM DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER KEYSER DTD 1/7/21: DFT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION GRANTED DFT SHALL RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT BY 2/4/21; Notes:KEYSER DTD 1/7/21: DFT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION GRANTED DFT SHALL RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT BY 2/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO FILE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT (F/B DFT)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/09/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3838652; Notes:$10.00 3838652 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:pdeltoro@lawgroupsf.com;ncarvajal@lawgroupsf.com;pleadings@lawgroupsf.com AS TO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3834617; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:12/07/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3834617; Notes:$401.00 3834617 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AB: Circuit Civil Central - AB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WATLEE CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAZI, RYAN S