This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 08:41:28 (UTC).

MOISTURE RID INC A/A/O JAMME THOMAS V UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 MOISTURE RID INC A/A/O JAMME THOMAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MOISTURE RID INC A/A/O JAMME THOMAS

Defendant and Respondent

UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

O'HARA , JESSE L

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LASTELLA , PHILLIP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

07/27/2022:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

ORDER RESETTING

07/25/2022:ORDER RESETTING

NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

06/30/2022:NOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

06/30/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DFT

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DFT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 57.105

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 57.105

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF COUNSEL NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF COUNSEL NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DFT

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DFT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT STATEMENT OF CLAIM

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER OF TRANSFER VENUE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ORDER OF TRANSFER VENUE AND ORDER CLOSING CASE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF COUNSEL NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF COUNSEL NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL WITHIN FIRM

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM VIA TELECONFERENCE

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM VIA TELECONFERENCE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT MOTION TO DISMISS

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT MOTION TO DISMISS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF RESPONSE TO DFT MOTION TO DISMISS

06/22/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLTF RESPONSE TO DFT MOTION TO DISMISS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Notes: F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6K (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESETTING; Notes: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR SPECIALLY SET HRG VIA ZOOM ON AUG 9 2022 @ 12:15PM -JUDGE GARRISON 7/25/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes: ESERVICE@LOVEGROVELASTELLA.COM;PHILLIP@LOVEGROVELASTELLA.COM;ESERVICE@FLATFEELEGALSERVICE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE; Notes: ESERVICE@LOVEGROVELASTELLA.COM;PHILLIP@LOVEGROVELASTELLA.COM;ESERVICE@FLATFEELEGALSERVICE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/26/2022 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/26/2022 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4509232; Receipt Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $300.00; total Amount Paid: $300.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/22/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Notes: DFT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTF INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DIMISS PLTF COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE; Notes: DFT SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DIMISS PLTF COMPLAINT FOR IMPROPER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING; Notes: ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON DFT MOTION TO DISMISS; Notes: DFT MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING RULING ON DFT MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS; Notes: CIVIL ACTION SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: DFT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DFT MOTION TO DISMISS; Notes: DFT MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes: PROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY; Notes: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO PALM BEACH COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $300.00 ON RECEIPT 4509232; Notes: $300.00 4509232 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOISTURE RID INC. AS ASSIGNEE OF ANGELA B. WOMACK-JOHNSON is a litigant

Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant