This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 13:15:16 (UTC).

MODERN MEDICINE INC AAO ROODELINE PIERRE V AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 MODERN MEDICINE INC AAO ROODELINE PIERRE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRISTOW , APRIL and SHERMAN , JAMES W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRISTOW , APRIL

SHERMAN , JAMES W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MODERN MEDICINE INC AAO ROODELINE PIERRE

Defendant and Respondent

AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GREENE , TRAVIS

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

RICO-WHAN , RETTA J

 

Court Documents

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

05/11/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

05/10/2022:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

ORDER RESETTING

05/09/2022:ORDER RESETTING

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT LETTER

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT LETTER

CERTIFIED COPY

04/06/2022:CERTIFIED COPY

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT LETTER

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT LETTER

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMO OF DISPOSITION

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT MEMO OF DISPOSITION

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED HEARING NOTEBOOK

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED HEARING NOTEBOOK

CERTIFIED COPY

04/06/2022:CERTIFIED COPY

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO RELY ON AFFIDAVIT OF LINDSEY MAYO

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING AND INTENT TO RELY ON AFFIDAVIT OF LINDSEY MAYO

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING HEARING NOTEBOOK

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT NOTICE OF FILING HEARING NOTEBOOK

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING, STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS AND FOR LACK OF VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT AND TO TRANSFER VENUE FOR FORUM NON-CONVENIENS WITH SUPPORTING ME

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING, STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS AND FOR LACK OF VENUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT AND TO TRANSFER VENUE FOR FORUM NON-CONVENIENS WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF HEAIUNG (15-MINUTES SPECIAL SET

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF HEAIUNG (15-MINUTES SPECIAL SET

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT ZOOM/VIRTUAL NOTICE OF SPECIAL SET HEARING

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS 20 DAY CORPORATE SERVICE

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT SUMMONS 20 DAY CORPORATE SERVICE

TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

04/06/2022:TRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes: VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: MB; Room: 6L (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PARTIES NOT PRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Notes: WITH COURTS ORDER RE-SETTIN G PRETRIAL CONFERENCE F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 5/11/2022 1:00:00 PM due to; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 6/1/2022 3:30 PM BRISTOW, APRIL; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 6/1/2022 3:30 PM BRISTOW, APRIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESETTING; Notes: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR JUNE 1 2022 @ 3:30PM VIA ZOOM -JUDGE BRISTOW 5/9/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4416456; Receipt Amount: $55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $55.00; total Amount Paid: $55.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/06/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT CIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT UNIFORM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND RELATED REQUIREMENTS (GENERAL PATHWAY - COUNTY CIVIL PROCEDURE CASES; Notes: UNIFORM CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND RELATED REQUIREMENTS (GENERAL PATHWAY - COUNTY CIVIL PROCEDURE CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING ADJUSTER CODE OF ETHICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING ON TRANSFER CASE; Notes: FLPIP@ANL-LAW.COM; SERVICE.RJR@DUTTONLAWGROUP.COM EMAILED TO ATTY'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 5/11/2022 1:00 PM BRISTOW, APRIL; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 5/11/2022 1:00 PM BRISTOW, APRIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING UPON TRANSFER; Notes: FLPIP@ANL-LAW.COM; SERVICE.RJR@DUTTONLAWGROUP.COM EMAILED TO ATTY'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $55.00 ON RECEIPT 4416456; Notes: $55.00 4416456 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RF: County Civil Central - RF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MODERN MEDICINE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Auto Club South Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greene, Travis