This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/09/2021 at 19:50:40 (UTC).

MILLER, JEFFREY V DELRAY BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 MILLER, JEFFREY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DELRAY BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY , G JOSEPH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY , G JOSEPH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MILLER , JEFFREY

Respondent and Defendant

DELRAY BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

MORGAN JR ESQ, KENNETH W

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

03/05/2021:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION; Notes:NOTICE OF MEDIATION 06/25/2021 10:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE DELRAY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. - 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE F/B K MORGAN OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3938987; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:03/09/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:03/09/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3938987; Notes:$411.00 3938987 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AI: Circuit Civil Central - AI (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:smf.pleadings@fortheinjured.com;mrobidoux@fortheinjured.com;mclark@fortheinjured.com DELRAY BEACH MEDICAL CENTER INC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan Jr, Kenneth W, ESQ.