This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/17/2022 at 23:02:01 (UTC).

MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2017 2 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB V ALTIDOR, MARIE G

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2017 2 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALTIDOR, MARIE G. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MILL CITY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2017 2 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB

Defendants and Respondents

ALTIDOR , MARIE G

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIE G ALTIDOR

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KISER , AMY M

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ROSSIN , ALLEN E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/07/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

04/07/2022:COMPLAINT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/07/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS BOOK 33474 PAGE 766-767

04/07/2022:LIS PENDENS BOOK 33474 PAGE 766-767

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/07/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

04/07/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $966.60 ON RECEIPT 4421861

04/11/2022:PAID $966.60 ON RECEIPT 4421861

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/13/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/28/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

04/28/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/03/2022:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO THE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516 F/B ATTY ALLEN E. ROSSIN OBO DFT VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAITON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFT VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC - 04/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4421861; Receipt Amount: $966.60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $966.60; total Amount Paid: $966.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 04/11/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efilings@gilbertgrouplaw.com;akiser@gilbertgrouplaw.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT #1 EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efilings@gilbertgrouplaw.com;akiser@gilbertgrouplaw.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us AS TO VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efilings@gilbertgrouplaw.com;akiser@gilbertgrouplaw.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARIE G. ALTIDOR EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efilings@gilbertgrouplaw.com;akiser@gilbertgrouplaw.com;courtxpress@firmsolutions.us AS TO MARIE G. ALTIDOR EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY KISER OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33474 PAGE 766-767; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VILLAGE OF SANDALWOOD LAKES SOUTH HOMEOWNERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Mill City Mortgage Loan Trust 2017 1 Wilmington Sa is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kiser, Amy Marie