This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/18/2019 at 19:01:39 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC V FLUSS, JAMES

Case Summary

On 10/14/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLUSS, JAMES. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant and Respondent

FLUSS , JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RUSSELL , RICHARD A

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESETTING

11/07/2019:ORDER RESETTING

REPLY/RESPONSE

10/28/2019:REPLY/RESPONSE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/22/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/16/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3370000

10/16/2019:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3370000

SUMMONS REQUESTED

10/14/2019:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • SET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 12/3/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 12/3/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Cancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 11/19/2019 9:00:00 AM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RESETTING; Notes:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 12/3/2019 AT 9:00 A.M. - SIGNED JUDGE CASTOR 11/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE JAMES FLUSS - 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • SET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 11/19/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 11/19/2019 9:00 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3370000; Notes:$185.00 3370000 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:WITHIN COURT FILING- E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Receipt Number:3370000; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Due Date:10/16/2019; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:NB; Room:#1 (North Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • CANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:NB; Room:#1 (North Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less