Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/07/2021 at 19:18:06 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. V WILLIS, DELLISSA

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIS, DELLISSA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant and Respondent

WILLIS , DELLISSA

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MOORE , ASHLEY L

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/09/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

06/02/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

COMPLAINT

06/02/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4050870

06/03/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4050870

SUMMONS REQUESTED

06/02/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/02/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:NB; Room:#1 (North Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED DELLISSA WILLIS - 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4050870; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:06/03/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:06/03/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/13/2021 8:45 AM STEPHENS, JUDGEDEBRA MOSES; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/13/2021 8:45 AM STEPHENS, JUDGEDEBRA MOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4050870; Notes:$185.00 4050870 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE , ASHLEY L