This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 12/21/2021 at 19:21:41 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. V TRESCASTRO, JUAN

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TRESCASTRO, JUAN. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant and Respondent

TRESCASTRO , JUAN

Lake Worth, FL 33461-2074

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

CHATANI , PAYAL

GREEN , JOHAN A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/16/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

11/16/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4252242

11/17/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4252242

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/17/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/06/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/14/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ORDER SETTING HEARING

12/16/2021:ORDER SETTING HEARING

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

12/17/2021:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes:PLT ATTY PRESENT DFT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6M (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Notes:MANDATORY CMC ON 1/18/2022@3:30PM VIA ZOOM -JUDGE SHULLMAN DTD 12/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE JUAN TRESCASTRO - 12/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4252242; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/17/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:11/17/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:IL_FL@MCMCG.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 12/16/2021 10:00 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 12/16/2021 10:00 AM SHULLMAN, SARAH L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4252242; Notes:$310.00 4252242 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHATANI , PAYAL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI